EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR MICROCIRCULATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to enhance the understanding of the function of the microcirculation in health and disease, to advance the study of the flow of blood and other tissue fluids especially in the smallest vessels and or matters related there to. It encourages the exchange of knowledge and ideas through the interaction of international scientific conferences which the society holds every 2 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- China
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Russia
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 26 May 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Brown | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|||||
PROF NICOLA BROWN | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Beat A Imhof | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR AKOS KOLLER MD, PHD | Trustee | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANGELA CAROLE SHORE PHD BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.81k | £8.81k | £6.05k | £8.57k | £15.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.11k | £756 | £2.64k | £9.16k | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1964 AS AMENDED 21ST JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF THE FLOW OF BLOOD AND OTHER TISSUE FLUIDS ESPECIALLY IN THE SMALL VESSELS AND OTHER MATTERS RELATED THRETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF SHEFFIELD
Department of Oncology & Metabolism
Beech Hill Road
Sheffield
S10 2RX
- Phone:
- 01142159001
- Email:
- n.j.brown@sheffield.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window