SRI GURU RAVIDASS SABHA UK, EUROPE AND ABROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
National Supreme Council of Ravidassia Faith overlooking all the UK abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 February 1973: Standard registration
- SHRI GURU RAVIDASS SABHA UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dalawer Singh Bagha | Chair | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAN HUMRAJ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAGROOP SAMPLAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARMESH LAI GHINDA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARMINDER KUMAR SEGAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JASBIR RAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.06k | £4.09k | £51.13k | £5.60k | £3.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £0 | £36.68k | £4.73k | £4.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 April 2024 | 452 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 April 2024 | 452 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 April 2024 | 814 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 April 2024 | 1179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED JANUARY 1973 AS AMENDED 30 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND SPREAD THE RAVIDASSIA FAITH BY: (A) ENCOURAGING THE COMMUNITY TO STRICTLY FOLLOW THE TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI; (B) UNDERTAKING TO PUBLISH AND CIRCULATE LITERATURE ON THE LIFE, TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI AND SUPPORT PUBLICATIONS SUCH AS THE "BEGUMPURA PARIVAR"; (C) HOLDING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND SIMILAR EVENTS IN WHICH MANY SCHOLARS AND RESEARCHERS ARE INVOLVED; AND (D) DIRECTING YOUNG GENERATION TO UNDERSTAND AND FOLLOW CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS OF THE RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 UNION ROW
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B21 9EN
- Phone:
- 0121 523 9593
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
WWW.Shrigururavidasssabhauk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window