Financial history JACKMANS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 265222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.84k £62.39k £69.24k £78.55k £91.05k
Total expenditure £67.26k £68.76k £64.52k £134.32k £80.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A