MEDICAL COUNCIL ON ALCOHOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are predominately involved with the production of educational literature regarding the affects of alcohol in health for medical students. The charity is also involved with assisting medical colleagues with alcohol related problems as well as responding to a large number of enquiries from the media and from patients and relatives about alcohol and its affects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 February 1973: Standard registration
- THE MEDICAL COUNCIL ON ALCOHOL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN DRUMMOND | Chair | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Jane Marshall | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Steven Masson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Alexander Dougan | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marsha Morgan | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR D FLORIN | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR E GILVARY | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR A THILLAINAYAGAM | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR P RICE | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JONATHAN CHICK | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR I SMITH | Trustee | 13 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRUCE RITSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR A YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.82k | £188.66k | £214.41k | £206.68k | £211.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.38k | £160.92k | £171.78k | £204.00k | £204.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH APRIL 1969 AND AMENDED 23RD JULY 1974, 5TH SEPTEMBER 1980, 3RD NOVEMBER 1992 AND 17 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY TO PROVIDE AN ORGANISATION OF REGISTERED MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS WITH A VIEW TO THE CO-ORDINATION OF EFFORT, THE BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF ALCOHOLISM AND ITS PREVENTION AND THE TREATMENT AND AFTER-CARE OF ALCOHOLISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Medical Council on Alcohol
2 St Andrews Place
London
NW1 4LB
- Phone:
- 02074874445
- Email:
- finance@m-c-a.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window