Financial history THE ADINT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 265290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £193.35k £142.61k £189.89k £236.94k £217.32k
Total expenditure £345.33k £548.62k £544.06k £512.74k £337.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A