THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF RAVENSWOOD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage and run a small shop within the unit at Ravenswood, any surplus funds are spent for benefit of patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 August 1974: Standard registration
- 28 May 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS RAVENSWOOD HOUSE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.77k | £19.68k | £19.25k | £11.69k | £20.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.14k | £17.39k | £16.76k | £7.45k | £10.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 19 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 05 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JUNE 1974 AS AMENDED 20TH OCTOBER 1993 AND 18 AUGUST, 2000.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF PATIENTS AT RAVENSWOOD HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES AT THIS HOSPITAL, WORKSHOPS AND SHOP FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING THE ABOVE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE LEAGUE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS:
Area of benefit
FAREHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window