Accounts and annual returns THE DOWDING MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 265340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 01 August 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 June 2024 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 September 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required