Financial history THE ISLES OF SCILLY MEDICAL LAUNCH TRUST

Charity number: 265346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.83k £16.95k £17.25k £20.87k £25.61k
Total expenditure £20.11k £18.62k £20.87k £24.70k £23.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £8.00k £8.00k