Financial history THE HUDSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 265368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.81k £3.68k £3.00k £2.40k £1.43k
Total expenditure £48.34k £64.90k £29.90k £22.20k £27.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A