THE DOVER AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 30 March 1973: Standard registration
- 17 October 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 October 2006: Funds transferred to 1108967 DOVER DEAL AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
- DOVER C A B (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.32k | £55.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.31k | £42.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 07 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 07 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH AUGUST 1971 AND AMENDED 19TH MAY 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN DOVER AND DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
DOVER AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window