ALDERNEY MANOR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Renting hall for over 60,s social events, harbourside Trust Care,Scope.Church Meetings etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Total income includes £6,334 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Poole
Governance
- 06 April 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Crighton | Chair | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andy Cole | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN STOKES | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.61k | £40.35k | £97.08k | £40.68k | £19.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.03k | £56.24k | £50.62k | £50.48k | £34.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.89k | £1.83k | £1.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £6.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2023 | 736 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH APRIL 1968
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALDERNEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
ALDERNEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alderney Manor Community Centre
287 Herbert Avenue
POOLE
Dorset
BH12 4HT
- Phone:
- 01202 740026
- Email:
- mikeholandporter@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window