MASONIC TRUST OF EAST AFRICA

Charity number: 265432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To give financial assistance to Freemasons or their dependants who have been members of a Masonic Lodge in Kenya, Uganda or Tanzania.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £358
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Kenya
  • Tanzania
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 March 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • M T E A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dilipkumar Bansilal Rambhai Patel Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
NORMAN DAVID GILLETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.19k £5.65k £21 £1.60k £358
Total expenditure £1.05k £4.52k £5.06k £744 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 May 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HUMPHRIES KIRK LLP
17 MARKET STREET
CREWKERNE
TA18 7JU
Phone:
01460279104
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available