ROYAL ARMY DENTAL CORPS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTES THE EFFICIENCY OF THEARMY BY MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE ARMYDENTAL SERVICE, FOSTERING FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM, FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP ANDWELFARE OFTHE ARMY DENTAL SERVICE AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major General Ewan Blythe Carmichael CBE | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Necku Stephenson | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retired Paul George Mannering OStJ | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Grannells | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Boslem | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Retired Katherine Richardson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Johnston | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Timothy John Davies | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.36k | £55.47k | £58.64k | £66.50k | £62.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.83k | £30.87k | £41.39k | £46.50k | £16.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSOCIATION RULES AS AMENDED 7TH MARCH 1973 AND AS AMENDED 18TH NOVEMBER 1992 & 20 SEPTEMBER 2003. as amended on 13 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY BY (1) MAINTAIN CONTACT BETWEEN FORMER AND SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ARMY DENTAL SERVICE (THE ADS), FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING FOR SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM; AND (2) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF THE ADS AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS. B. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OR PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE ADS, AND THEIR DEPENDENTS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS BENEFICIARIES).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RADC AMS RHQ
Robertson House
Slim Road
Camberley
Surrey
GU15 4NP
- Phone:
- 07845641980
- Email:
- radcregsec@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window