THE ACROSS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1971: Standard registration
- 12 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE JUMBULANCE PEOPLE (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 06 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF AGREEMENT DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1973.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS THE CONSTRUCTION AND OPERATION OF A PURPOSE-BUILT VEHICLE OR VEHICLES TO TRANSPORT INVALIDS SICK PERSONS HANDICAPPED DISABLED AND INFIRM WHETHER MOBILE SEMI-MOBILE CHAIRBOUND OR CONFINED TO BED TO THE SHRINE OF OUR LADY OF LOURDES FRANCE OR TO SUCH OTHER PLACES OF PILGRIMAGE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window