MSI REPRODUCTIVE CHOICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MSI Reproductive Choices is one of the world's leading providers of sexual and reproductive healthcare. We believe that everyone should have the right to choose. From contraception to safe abortion and life-saving post- abortion care, we are committed to delivering compassionate, high- quality services. Our 9,000 team members work across 37 countries, reaching over 35,000 women each day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£414,355,000
Donations and legacies | £88.19m | |
Charitable activities | £319.15m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.26m | |
Other | £1.76m |
Total expenditure:
£313,839,000
Raising funds | £2.07m | |
Charitable activities | £311.77m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,602,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £64,606,092 from 190 government contract(s) and £3,951,646 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £311.77m | |
Retained for future use | £100.52m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.07m | |
Charitable expenditure | £311.77m | |
Retained for future use | £102.12m |
People

8830 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 64 |
£70k to £80k | 40 |
£80k to £90k | 20 |
£90k to £100k | 12 |
£100k to £110k | 8 |
£110k to £120k | 11 |
£120k to £130k | 6 |
£130k to £140k | 5 |
£140k to £150k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 5 |
£200k to £250k | 3 |
£250k to £300k | 3 |
£450k to £500k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Bolivia
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Cambodia
- China
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- East Timor
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Romania
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United States
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 09 May 1973: Standard registration
- 11 July 2022: Funds received from 1187935 INTERNATIONAL CAMPAIGN FOR WOMEN'S RIGHT TO SAFE A...
- MARIE STOPES INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- POPULATION SERVICES (FAMILY PLANNING PROGRAMME) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Slack | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tania Holt | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Myriam Assa Sidibe | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MARGARET DUBY | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR Franki Nicolas Braeken | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohsina Ahsan Bilgrami | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE EMMA MORRIS | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr KRISTIN ANNE RUTTER | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.27m | £294.44m | £290.63m | £322.50m | £414.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.41m | £288.10m | £282.69m | £302.08m | £313.84m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60.47m | £61.52m | £52.99m | £57.23m | £64.61m | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.86m | £13.90m | £9.94m | £2.42m | £3.95m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.83m | £10.04m | £10.78m | £9.74m | £88.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £293.03m | £277.27m | £271.38m | £308.80m | £319.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.43m | £861.00k | £733.00k | £1.81m | £5.26m | |
|
Income - Other | £4.98m | £6.28m | £7.74m | £2.16m | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £294.18k | £35.00k | £82.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £300.15m | £286.83m | £281.67m | £300.66m | £311.77m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.26m | £1.27m | £1.02m | £1.42m | £2.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.25m | £1.28m | £1.20m | £1.24m | £1.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £16.73m | £16.24m | £9.33m | £6.23m | £7.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £41.00k | £41.00k | £53.66k | £54.20k | £67.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £35.09m | £32.19m | £31.20m | £31.38m | £31.67m | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.00m | £15.10m | £17.08m | £15.71m | £17.55m | |
|
Other assets | £165.88m | £188.65m | £216.85m | £237.79m | £303.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £96.23m | £114.35m | £135.04m | £134.15m | £106.88m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/03/2013 as amended on 15 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SEXUAL, REPRODUCTIVE, MATERNAL AND GENERAL HEALTH SERVICES INCLUDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING, COUNSELLING, ADVOCACY, SCREENING, CLINICAL AND MEDICAL SERVICES AND TREATMENT TO REDUCE MATERNAL MORTALITY, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SEXUAL HEALTH AND PREVENT POVERTY AND DISTRESS RESULTING FROM UNPLANNED CONCEPTION TO CARRY OUT AND/OR PROMOTE THE CARRYING OUT OF RESEARCH RELATING TO SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, MATERNAL AND GENERAL HEALTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MSI Reproductive Choices
1 Conway St
Fitzroy Square
London
- Phone:
- 02070342369
- Email:
- info@msichoices.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window