RURAL AGE CONCERN DARENT VALLEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates in North West Kent/South East London. Provides hot lunches and activities at 4 day centres, signposting advice & information, chiropody clinics, eye concern clinics, reqular door-to-door weekly minibus shopping trips and day trips
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £120,281 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 08 May 1973: Standard registration
- 12 July 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1180662 THE COTTAGE COMMUNITY
- AGE CONCERN DARENT VALLEY (Working name)
- AGE CONCERN SWANLEY (Working name)
- RACDV (Working name)
- AGE CONCERN DARTFORD RURAL (Previous name)
- DARTFORD RURAL DISTRICT OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.61k | £187.54k | £186.27k | £180.62k | £171.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.13k | £154.18k | £159.92k | £173.87k | £174.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £126.28k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £124.69k | £124.69k | £2.40k | £120.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 17 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 17 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
30 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/03/1979 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/1979 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF RURAL AGE CONCERN DARENT VALLEY AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 1.
Area of benefit
NORTHERN PARISHES OF SEVENOAKS DISTRICT COUNCIL AND SOUTHERN PARISHES OF DARTFORD BOROUGH COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window