THE FINCHLEY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an amateur choir of about 90 members, with a broad age range and a young and enthusiastic conductor. Each season we rehearse and perform three main concerts of classical music with professional soloists and instrumentalists. Every two years or so, we make a short concert tour. In October 2013, we visited Haarlem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
- Hertfordshire
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 04 May 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vicki Frances Redpath | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Davis | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Crane | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Crowe | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Withey | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carol Whiter | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALICE SELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL EMERSON GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.84k | £7.17k | £16.43k | £22.83k | £22.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.57k | £6.10k | £17.77k | £20.17k | £19.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1970 AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 1978, 19TH MAY 1980 AND 11TH OCTOBER 1982 AND 11TH JUNE 2001 AND 8TH OCTOBER 2001.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE FOR THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC, AND THE FOSTERING OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 TAVISTOCK AVENUE
LONDON
NW7 1GA
- Phone:
- 02083710103
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window