Financial history THE JAMES BEATTIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 265654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £85.67k £63.78k £86.70k £89.35k £86.52k
Total expenditure £182.84k £195.17k £167.86k £141.45k £100.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A