THE JAMES BEATTIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable donations primarily in the Wolverhampton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 May 1973: Standard registration
- THE PERTON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Richard Archer | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES BOYCE | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE VICTORIA REDSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Michael Redshaw | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH CHARLES DOLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSANNAH NORBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.67k | £63.78k | £86.70k | £89.35k | £86.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.84k | £195.17k | £167.86k | £141.45k | £100.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 FEB 1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 NOV 1991 AS AMENDED ON 01 JAN 2025 AS AMENDED ON 17 APR 2025
Charitable objects
The relief and assistance of people in need within the Wolverhampton area, and the furthering of their opportunities, by providing grants and donations to organisations that support them.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LARGELY WOLVERHAMPTON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
P O BOX 132
LEOMINSTER
HEREFORDSHIRE
HR6 6DQ
- Phone:
- 000000000
- Website:
-
jamesbeattietrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window