Accounts and annual returns A A WINTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 265681
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required