Financial history THE FAIRHAVEN GARDEN TRUST

Charity number: 265686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £629.29k £487.25k £441.65k £508.61k £569.04k
Total expenditure £699.73k £422.20k £483.74k £594.61k £582.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £142.52k £4.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.76k N/A N/A £1.69k £12.74k
Income - Other trading activities £356.81k N/A N/A £279.19k £340.18k
Income - Charitable activities £252.31k N/A N/A £221.92k £207.25k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.40k N/A N/A £5.81k £8.88k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £278.77k N/A N/A £255.08k £229.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £420.95k N/A N/A £335.27k £349.52k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £4.26k £2.66k