SELSEY VENTURE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary minibus transport for elderly/infirm residents of Selsey to encourage and assist such residents to take a full and active part in local community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Beal | Chair | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Beal | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evy Chapman | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ellsmore-Creed | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNN UNITT | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WELLS | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.38k | £13.83k | £21.25k | £25.28k | £23.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.88k | £14.11k | £22.40k | £30.40k | £97.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £425 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MAY 1973 AS AMENDED 23RD JUNE 1992, 24TH JUNE 1997 AND 25TH JUNE 2007. as amended on 12 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND DISABLED IN SELSEY. (FOR FURTHER INFORMATION SEE CLAUSE 5 OF THE RULES AND CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SELSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Selsey Venture Club
Rhodes House
Elm Grove
Selsey
CHICHESTER
West Sus
- Phone:
- 01243605115
- Email:
- ventureclubselsey@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window