Financial history COLEVIEW COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 265702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £166.95k £142.07k £137.27k £110.67k £118.81k
Total expenditure £177.45k £126.84k £105.54k £134.94k £193.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £28.00k £37.38k £4.00k N/A