Financial history THE GREEK CATHEDRAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 265710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £398.80k £478.20k £370.58k £486.83k £414.85k
Total expenditure £518.89k £368.50k £321.53k £431.87k £384.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A