THE GREEK CATHEDRAL TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 265710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The activities of the charity are focussed on the preservation of the Greek Cathedral in London W2. Church services and the operation of the Cathedral are carried out by 4 employed staff.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £414,854
Total expenditure: £384,824

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anastassis Nicolas Fafalios Trustee 23 March 2016
None on record
JOHN M LYRAS Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
MICHAEL F LYKIARDOPULO Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
MICHAEL C LEMOS Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
STAMOS J FAFALIOS Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £398.80k £478.20k £370.58k £486.83k £414.85k
Total expenditure £518.89k £368.50k £321.53k £431.87k £384.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 26 MARCH 1950
Charitable objects
TO HELP OR AFFORD TEMPORARY RELIEF TO ALL DERSERVING ORTHODOX GREEKS IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE RESIDING OR PASSING THROUGH LONDON AND TO HELP IN REPATRIATING THOSE UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES IN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Registration history
  • 04 June 1973 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
ST. SOPHIAS CHURCH VICARAGE
MOSCOW ROAD
LONDON
W2 4LQ
Phone:
02038870692