Trustees ERITH THEATRE GUILD LIMITED
Charity number: 265765

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Bate | Chair | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stephen Peter Hopkins | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Mary Leese | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Katherine Guenigault | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaquelyn Clare Fenton | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Pearce | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Lynn Butler | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Witham | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Pocock | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Matthew Davies | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.