FELLOWSHIP OF THE KNIGHTS OF THE ROUND TABLE OF KING ARTHUR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Cornwall
Governance
- 24 May 1973: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 12 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 1 DECEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TINTAGEL AND NEIGHBOURING PARISHES FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
TINTAGEL AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window