THE ALPHA OMEGA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to raise funds via gift aid and covenants and to donate these funds to encourage and maintain the highest ethical and clinical standards of dental practice, to support the policy board of the Hebrew University - Hadassah School of Dental Medicine, assist dental education in Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 31 August 1973: Standard registration
- 24 January 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 04 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ANDREW HOWARD ERIC EDER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Selouk | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eddie Scher | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR ARON MARCUS BDS | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN WOLFFE | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR MERVYN DRUIAN BDS | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR STEPHEN HANDELSMAN BDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.48k | £43.00k | £25.62k | £29.69k | £19.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.86k | £13.08k | £32.42k | £52.68k | £31.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 3RD MAY 1972
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS: 1. SHALL BEST ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN CONNECTION WITH DENTISTRY. 2. SHALL MOST TEND TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF METHODS OF DENTISTRY. 3. SHALL ASSIST THE PERSONS ENGAGED OR HAVING BEEN ENGAGED IN THE DENTAL PROFESSION AND THE WIVES WIDOWS CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 9
Addison House
Grove End Road
London
NW8 9EH
- Phone:
- 02083493924
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window