MARGARET HAYMAN CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants in areas determined by Trustees from time to time. Current focus is on the intersection between climate change and social justice in low income countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Burkina Faso
- Kenya
- Malawi
Governance
- 14 June 1973: Standard registration
- MARGARET HAYTIAN CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Hayman | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RUTH WASSERMANN | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE WASSERMANN | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
FRAN BURY | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE WASSERMANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE CAROLYN HAYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.56k | £44.34k | £39.17k | £41.59k | £38.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.20k | £91.73k | £84.87k | £114.14k | £120.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 11TH MAY 1973
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A LIKE NOTICE DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36A LAWFORD ROAD
LONDON
NW5 2LN
- Phone:
- 02079162689
- Email:
- Carolyn.hayman@pobox.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window