THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE CHARD AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To supply products and services not supplied by NHS to Chard Hospital, to assist staff in their treatment of patients and for us to supply services for the comfort of patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 09 November 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Miskin | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Cooper | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tania Collin | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Brice-Bullows | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Green | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Drew | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Angela Burton | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dave Bulmer | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS N K ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £1.60k | £3.66k | £6.37k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £14.42k | £1.48k | £2.52k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1973, AMENDED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 22 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE CHARD AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Helmstedt Way
CHARD
TA20 1DQ
- Phone:
- 0146066640
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window