BORDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wide variety of Fundraising events throughout the year Hall used by local community for childrens and adult parties Annual Harvest Supper and Carol Party Regular meetings such as Residents' Association, Parish Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 November 1973: Standard registration
- BORDEN WOOD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- BORDEN VILLAGE HALL AND CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saskia Foss | Chair | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Cobb | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Didier Minneboo | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Niven | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Cridlan | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ana de Barros | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Forster | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Cox | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Foss | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Owens | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Wassenberg | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Emma Jane Cridlan | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.46k | £9.24k | £737 | £5.66k | £389 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | £3.60k | £5.42k | £4.98k | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28TH AUGUST 1970 AND 19TH OCTOBER 1973
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF MILLAND, STEDHAM WITH IPING AND TROTTON WITH CHITHURST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANDINGS COTTAGE
BORDEN VILLAGE
MILLAND
LIPHOOK
GU30 7JZ
- Phone:
- 01730818453
- Email:
- bordenvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window