PETWORTH AND DISTRICT OVER 60'S DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a meeting place for senior citizens in, and around, the Petworth area thus encouraging companionship and conversation. Numerous activities and outings are arranged throughout the year together with regular scrabble, bingo, card and quiz sessions. The centre is generally open Monday to Friday between 10.00am and 12.00pm and in the afternoons between 2.00pm and 4.00pm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 June 1973: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDSHIP CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Mark Gilbert | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Brooke | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.84k | £62 | £9.23k | £4.06k | £4.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £3.23k | £3.20k | £2.11k | £2.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH MARCH 1973
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS, OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF PERWORTH AND DISTRICT IN TH COUNTY OF SUSSEX.
Area of benefit
PETWORTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 ORCHARD CLOSE
PETWORTH
GU28 0SA
- Phone:
- 07762721180
- Email:
- jean.huggett@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window