THE POOR CHARITY

Charity number: 265935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIEF OF POVERTY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £222
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Downes Trustee 20 February 2023
THE HASLINGFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HASLINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Claire Robertson Trustee 20 February 2023
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
HASLINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HASLINGFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michelle Golder Trustee 20 February 2023
HASLINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HASLINGFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Brian Sewell Trustee 20 February 2023
HASLINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HASLINGFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Benjamin Mavely Trustee 20 February 2023
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1 £0 £0 £2 £222
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £515 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
45 BADCOCK ROAD
HASLINGFIELD
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 1LF
Phone:
01223872328
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available