Governing document RADIO NENE VALLEY
Charity Number: 265936

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MAY 1973 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 1978 AS AMENDED ON 05 JAN 1998 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2010 as amended on 26 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO EXTEND AND IMPROVE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD-AGE THROUGH BROADCASTING RADIO PROGRAMMES TO HOSPITALS IN THE NORTHAMPTON AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTHAMPTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.