THE STAMMER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting both adults and children who stammer by providing resources and training to Speech & Language Therapists working through the Apple House speech therapy unit based at the Warneford Hospital, Oxford. The wider dissemination of the work through a grant award scheme available to therapists throughout the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS CHARLES | Chair | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Chesters | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major Ian McLean Horner | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DHANUSHKA TENNAKOON | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEN THATCHER | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
POLLY MITCHELL | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAILA TYRRELL | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID WARD | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF FORWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA ELLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL NKESE MARTHA KENNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BRIAN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.05k | £4.34k | £1.31k | £1.22k | £1.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.33k | £4.04k | £288 | £495 | £1.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH MAY 1973
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO TREATMENT FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE IMPEDIMENT OF STAMMERING IN THEIR SPEECH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Fitzharrys Road
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX14 1EL
- Phone:
- 07504819851
- Email:
- chair@stammertrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window