Trustees THE STAMMER TRUST
Charity number: 265938

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS CHARLES | Chair | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Chesters | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major Ian McLean Horner | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DHANUSHKA TENNAKOON | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEN THATCHER | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
POLLY MITCHELL | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAILA TYRRELL | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID WARD | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF FORWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA ELLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL NKESE MARTHA KENNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BRIAN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.