THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity signposts parents of children with dyslexia and adults with dyslexia to tutors and assessments. We have a helpline, website and facebook page and will respond to queries from any age group. The charity gives out financial bursaries for assessments and tutoring to parents on low income, if there are sufficient funds in the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Nicola Penketh | Chair | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Beverley Tudor | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
INGVILD GOFF | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Hamilton | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.20k | £4.71k | £906 | £769 | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.05k | £6.59k | £1.26k | £2.71k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JUNE 1973 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DYSLEXIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 FERNDALES CLOSE
UP HATHERLEY
CHELTENHAM
GL51 3XH
- Phone:
- 07908729820
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window