Financial history THE CHETWODE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 265950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £80.35k £83.51k £81.18k £90.70k £93.00k
Total expenditure £129.62k £85.65k £97.44k £112.27k £116.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A