Trustees THE FREDA PARRY SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity Number: 265970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SANDRA GUNDY Chair
None on record
Emma Louise Lindsey Trustee 28 July 2023
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA MUSICAL FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Vivienne Cunningham Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
stepanie dawn duchar pickup Trustee 05 February 2018
None on record
ROBIN GRAHAM FAUTLEY Trustee 18 September 2017
None on record
EMMA LOUISE ROWE Trustee 19 September 2015
None on record
JENA CHUN-WAH PANG Trustee
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA MUSICAL FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time