FOULDEN RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 265977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To operate and maintain the Foulden Recreation Ground for the good of the village

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £598
Total expenditure: £542

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Foulden Parish Council Trustee 17 July 1973
FORMER HIGHWAY SURVEYOR'S LAND AT FOULDEN
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £38 £0 £2.04k £598
Total expenditure £97 £696 £0 £1.40k £542
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 October 2024 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
58 Hercules Road
Hellesdon
NORWICH
Norfolk
NR6 5HH
Phone:
07587275910