Financial history CANCER PREVENTION RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 265985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £158.18k £401.93k £829.13k £496.76k £864.06k
Total expenditure £294.33k £304.32k £729.73k £704.00k £1.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £820.94k N/A £798.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.45k N/A £15.01k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £30.18k N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £476 N/A £50.48k
Income - Other N/A N/A £6.26k N/A £561
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £790.75k N/A £772.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £685.72k N/A £971.24k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £43.73k N/A £41.89k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £175.72k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £510.00k N/A £700.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £288 N/A £0