BIRLING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides indoor and outdoor meeting and recreational facilities for the inhabitants of Birling and neighbouring villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 17 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Hope | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Warner | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Richards | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Rose Richards | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GUY NEVILL | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Randa William | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET VIOLET IVELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.52k | £14.75k | £6.90k | £4.97k | £6.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £5.43k | £4.74k | £16.02k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 January 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 384 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 4TH OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' CHURCH BIRLING
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Snodland Road
Birling
West Malling
ME19 5JG
- Phone:
- 01732873613
- Email:
- guy@birlingestate.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window