Financial history THE FARRER-BROWN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 265992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £22.08k £15.46k £14.72k £14.48k £20.22k
Total expenditure £18.78k £22.27k £15.20k £16.93k £15.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A