Accounts and annual returns KENT HANDICAPPED CARING ASSOCIATION (K H O C A )

Charity Number: 265993
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 17 November 2016 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 23 November 2015 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required