Governing document KENT HANDICAPPED CARING ASSOCIATION (K H O C A )
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 16TH MAY 1973 AS AMENDED 11TH DECEMBER 1981 20TH NOVEMBER 1985, 24TH NOVEMBER 1993 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE WELLBEING OF THOSE WITH SEVERE MENTAL DISABILITIES BY SUCH MEANS, BEING CHARITABLE, AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS. 2) TO FOSTER MENTAL HEALTH AND PROMOTE COOPERATION BETWEEN ANY SOCIETIES, CHARITABLE BODIES OR INDIVIDUALS WHO SHALL BE BENEFICIARIES UNDER THE TERMS OF THIS CONSTITUTION AND ALL THOSE WHO SHALL BE ENTRUSTED FOR THE TIME BEING WITH THE CARE OF SUCH BENEFICIARIES..
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.