THE PARISH OF ST PAUL'S AND ST LUKE'S, FINCHLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian worship and mission, service to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 24 July 1973: Standard registration
- ST PAULS (Working name)
- ST PAULS AND ST LUKES (Working name)
- ST PAULS CHURCH (Working name)
- ST PAULS SCHOOL AND PAROCHIAL HALL FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN FOX | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25 | £25 | £46.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £25 | £46.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 1900 (UV VOL, 110 PAGE 256) AND SCHEME DATED 29 MAY 1980
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF A LECTURE HALL AND PAROCHIAL ROOM WITH THE OBJECT OF PROMOTING RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS BY LAW ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF SAINT PAUL IN THE PARISH OF FINCHLEY AND OF OTHERWISE BENEFITING THE POORER PARISHIONERS THEREOF
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL DISTRICT OF ST PAUL IN THE PARISH OF FINCHLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 LONG LANE
LONDON
N3 2PU
- Phone:
- 02083468729
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window