THE BRAMLEY VILLAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Keep a watching brief on Planning issues affecting the life of the village, and make representations where appropriate. Promotion of village-based activities to strengthen the local community. Organise village social events including newcomers' evening, and summer social.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DES PARKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth Helen Sutherland | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Sheila Freeman | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Ann Weijman | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Francis Gordon Farr | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Darvill | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|||||
STEVEN CONSTANTINE MOSCHIDIS | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOE O'CONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.47k | £259 | £21.24k | £1.47k | £2.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.13k | £1.30k | £18.00k | £4.17k | £4.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/05/1973 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/1974 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/1977 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1981 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2015 AS AMENDED ON 11/08/2015
Charitable objects
A. TO SIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEIFT. B. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF DEVELOPMENT, PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BRAMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Eastwood Road
Bramley
Guildford
GU5 0DS
- Phone:
- 01483893905
- Website:
-
bramleyvillagesociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window