THE JAMES FREDERICK AND ETHEL ANNE MEASURES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps charitable organisations and individuals based in the West Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 14 August 1973: Standard registration
- THE MEASURES TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Brook | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Turner | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PETER GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RODNEY STUART WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALAN SECCOMBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.93k | £45.94k | £862.97k | £82.11k | £86.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.67k | £31.93k | £36.10k | £106.79k | £124.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £815.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £815.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £47.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £30.94k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £5.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £5.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 18TH APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE SETTLOR AND AFTER HER DEATH THE TRUSTEES SHALL DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5-6
Weekin Works
112-116 Park Hill Road
Harborne
BIRMINGHAM
B17 9HD
- Phone:
- 0121 233 1222
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window