Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED TEACHERS AND STUDENTS

Charity Number: 266056
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required