WOODBRIDGE ART CLUB
Charity number: 266063
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2004
Total income: £26,265
Total expenditure: £21,358
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Suffolk
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 August 1973: Standard registration
- 06 May 2005: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 21 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | 21 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JUNE 1973 AS AMENDED 17TH APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window